~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 18 2013 |
Application (12A725) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2013 to March 13, 2013, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Jan 18 2013 |
Application (12A725) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 13, 2013. |
Mar 13 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2013) |
Apr 11 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2013. |
Apr 30 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2013. |
May 24 2013 |
Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed. |
Jun 3 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Joseph F. Apuzzo filed. |
Jun 4 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 20, 2013. |
Jun 24 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |