~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 15 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2012) |
Jan 4 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 16, 2012. |
Jan 17 2012 |
Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. |
Feb 15 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 16, 2012. |
Mar 13 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 16, 2012. |
May 16 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 15, 2012. |
Jun 12 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 16, 2012. |
Jul 9 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 13, 2012. |
Aug 13 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 12, 2012. |
Sep 10 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 12, 2012. |
Oct 9 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2012. |
Nov 8 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 12, 2012. |
Dec 10 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 11, 2013. |
Jan 10 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 11, 2013. |
Feb 6 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 13, 2013. |
Mar 7 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 12, 2013. |
Apr 11 2013 |
Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Apr 11 2013 |
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |