No. 11-1528 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 25, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-5125) |
Decision Date: | April 10, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 20 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 25, 2012) |
Jul 17 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 24, 2012. |
Jul 25 2012 | Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed. |
Aug 15 2012 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 24, 2012. |
Sep 19 2012 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 24, 2012. |
Oct 19 2012 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2012. |
Nov 2 2012 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Nov 9 2012 | Reply of petitioner Northrop Corporation Employee Insurance Benefit Plans Master Trust filed. |
Nov 13 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 30, 2012. |
Dec 3 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric R. Fox | Ivins, Phillips & Barker | (202) 662-3406 |
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW | ||
Suite 600 | ||
Washignton, DC 20006 | ||
Party name: Northrop Corporation Employee Insurance Benefit Plans Master Trust | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States | ||
Other: | ||
Christopher M. Whitcomb | National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center | (202) 314-2024 |
1201 F Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
cwhitcomb@nahb.org | ||
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center |